PA SB1267 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-18 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-18 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing abatement of real estate taxes because of destruction or damage of property by Hurricane Irene or Tropical Storm Lee, or the refund of the amount of such taxes by certain political subdivisions; and authorizing assessment of properties retroactive to August 1, 2011, and a limited moratorium on the increase of certain real estate taxes.
Title
Authorizing abatement of real estate taxes because of destruction or damage of property by Hurricane Irene or Tropical Storm Lee, or the refund of the amount of such taxes by certain political subdivisions; and authorizing assessment of properties retroactive to August 1, 2011, and a limited moratorium on the increase of certain real estate taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-11-16 - Senate - SB 1267 PN 1722, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-14 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-11-14 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-26 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-18 | House | Referred to FINANCE |
2011-11-16 | House | In the House |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2011-11-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-11-14 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-11-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-10-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2011-09-28 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |