RI H8071 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- HAZARDOUS WASTE MANAGEMENT - Requires that the DEM rules and regulations for remediation of hazardous material releases not include any provision requiring the remediation of arsenic which is naturally occurring at levels less than 19 parts per million.
Title
Requires that the DEM rules and regulations for remediation of hazardous material releases not include any provision requiring the remediation of arsenic which is naturally occurring at levels less than 19 parts per million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2024) |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2024-05-23 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-05-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-14 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-10 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |