RI S2045 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires quasi-public corporations to use all funds and property to perform the function or service for which the quasi-public corporation was created.
Title
Quasi-public Corporations Accountability And Transparency Act
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2045.pdf |