TN HB0932 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to work with the Tennessee higher education commission and the department of education to ensure that all appropriate programs of study are offered to prisoners seeking educational good time credit. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, requires the department to work with the Tennessee higher education commission and the department of education to ensure that all appropriate programs of study are offered to prisoners seeking educational good time credit. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2014-02-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/19/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/5/2014 |
2013-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2014 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0684 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0932&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0932.pdf |