TN HB0932 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the practice of optometry in space leased from manufacturers or retailers of ophthalmic materials, or general retailers, only where the optometrist's practice meets specific criteria for maintaining separation from the lessors; prohibits manufacturers and wholesalers from controlling or attempting to control the professional judgment or practice of an optometrist. - Amends TCA Section 63-8-113 and Section 63-8-125.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the practice of optometry in space leased from manufacturers or retailers of ophthalmic materials, or general retailers, only where the optometrist's practice meets specific criteria for maintaining separation from the lessors; prohibits manufacturers and wholesalers from controlling or attempting to control the professional judgment or practice of an optometrist. - Amends TCA Section 63-8-113 and Section 63-8-125.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee--Government Operations for review |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0936 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0932&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0932.pdf |