TN HB0932 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from the professional privilege tax physicians who are on inactive status and no longer earning income from the practice of medicine. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, exempts from the professional privilege tax physicians who are on inactive status and no longer earning income from the practice of medicine. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0235 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee