TN HB1500 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds additional injuries that are not covered by workers' compensation. - Amends TCA Section 50-6-110.
Title
As enacted, adds additional injuries that are not covered by workers' compensation. - Amends TCA Section 50-6-110.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407 | |
2009-05-26 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/26/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-05 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-21 | Action Def. in s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA to 4/28/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Employee Affairs of C&EA for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs of C&EA | |
2009-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Consumer & Employee Affairs | |
2009-02-19 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1909 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-23 - Pub. Ch. 407
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1500&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1500.pdf |