TN HB1500 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the Local Government Modernization Act of 2005 creates an ongoing, rather than one-time, duty of the comptroller of the treasury to ensure local governments are in compliance with the accounting and financial reporting standards established by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that the Local Government Modernization Act of 2005 creates an ongoing, rather than one-time, duty of the comptroller of the treasury to ensure local governments are in compliance with the accounting and financial reporting standards established by the Governmental Accounting Standards Board. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 3, Part 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 499 | |
2018-02-07 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-02-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/7/2018 |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/1/2018 |
2018-01-30 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-01-24 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 1/30/2018 |
2018-01-24 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 1/24/2018 |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2018-01-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-01-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-01-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1481 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-07 - Pub. Ch. 499