TN HB1500 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Cookeville, by ordinance adopted by a two-thirds vote, to levy an occupancy tax of not more than 3 percent on the privilege of staying in any hotel or motel in Cookeville; requires the ordinance to set forth the manner of collection and administration of the privilege tax; requires that all proceeds received by the municipality from the tax be used for tourism and economic development. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Cookeville, by ordinance adopted by a two-thirds vote, to levy an occupancy tax of not more than 3 percent on the privilege of staying in any hotel or motel in Cookeville; requires the ordinance to set forth the manner of collection and administration of the privilege tax; requires that all proceeds received by the municipality from the tax be used for tourism and economic development. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 348 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 05/10/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-18 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-12 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1509 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 348