TN HB1579 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes requirement that executive director of the real estate commission have passed the broker's examination. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Title
As introduced, deletes requirement that executive director of the real estate commission have passed the broker's examination. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to s/c Commerce Sub-committee | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee--Government Operations for review | |
2011-02-23 | P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1200 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1579&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB1579.pdf |