TN HB2694 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals statutory prohibition relative to possession of a firearm where alcoholic beverages are served. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1305.
Title
As introduced, repeals statutory prohibition relative to possession of a firearm where alcoholic beverages are served. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1305.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/06/2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/6/2010 | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for last calendar | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/17/2010 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2010-01-27 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3735 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB2694&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB2694.pdf |