TN HB2694 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites the charter for the Town of Alamo. - Amends Chapter 557 of the Private Acts of 1911; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, rewrites the charter for the Town of Alamo. - Amends Chapter 557 of the Private Acts of 1911; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36 | |
2018-03-19 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-15 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1713 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
SB2725 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 36
SB2725 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 36