TN HB2694 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: House Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the City of Springfield to levy a privilege tax of up to 3 percent upon the privilege of occupancy by a two-thirds vote of its governing body. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the City of Springfield to levy a privilege tax of up to 3 percent upon the privilege of occupancy by a two-thirds vote of its governing body. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on cal. Local Committee for 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2020-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | P1C. |
2020-02-05 | House | Intro. |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB2459 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Action deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee