TN SB0339 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 486
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the industrial development division, building finance committee, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 14 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Title
As enacted, extends the industrial development division, building finance committee, June 30, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 14 and Title 4, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 486 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 1/27/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 1/22/2014 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Gov. Ops Comm. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/20/2013 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0791 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-25 - Pub. Ch. 486