TN SB1200 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases age of persons allowed to use tobacco and vapor products from 18 years of age to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 43 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases age of persons allowed to use tobacco and vapor products from 18 years of age to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 39, Chapter 15; Title 43 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to last calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1454 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.