TN SB2459 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date by which TennCare must annually report to general assembly regarding pharmacy benefits under the medical assistance program from January 15 to February 1. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to coverage for prescription drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2233 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee