TN SB2725 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Pr. Ch. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, rewrites the charter for the Town of Alamo. - Amends Chapter 557 of the Private Acts of 1911; as amended.
Title
Subject to local approval, rewrites the charter for the Town of Alamo. - Amends Chapter 557 of the Private Acts of 1911; as amended.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Pr. Ch. 36 | |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2018-03-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2694 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-04 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 36