TX HB1825 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the consumption, possession, and sale of alcoholic beverages at certain performing arts facilities owned by certain school districts.
Title
Relating to the consumption, possession, and sale of alcoholic beverages at certain performing arts facilities owned by certain school districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#151 (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#142 (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#151 (Y: 105 N: 39 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#142 (Y: 107 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-12 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2023-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-19 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#151 |
2023-04-12 | House | Passed |
2023-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#142 |
2023-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverage Regulation
ARLINGTON ISD
ARLINGTON, CITY OF
Education
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
ARLINGTON ISD
ARLINGTON, CITY OF
Education
Education--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities