TX HB2015 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exemption from jury service for persons over a certain age.
Title
Relating to the exemption from jury service for persons over a certain age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#179 (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Read 2nd time RV#168 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#179 (Y: 138 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Read 2nd time RV#168 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-24 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-13 | House | Record vote RV#179 |
2023-04-13 | House | Passed |
2023-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | House | Record vote RV#168 |
2023-04-12 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-07 | House | Filed |