TX HB2054 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-08 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the commissioners court of a county to adopt an exemption from ad valorem taxation by the county of a portion, expressed as a dollar amount, of the appraised value of an individual's residence homestead.
Title
Relating to the authority of the commissioners court of a county to adopt an exemption from ad valorem taxation by the county of a portion, expressed as a dollar amount, of the appraised value of an individual's residence homestead.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB854 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Co-author authorized
HJR108 (Enabling for) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB854 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Co-author authorized
HJR108 (Enabling for) 2023-03-03 - Referred to Ways & Means
SB854 (Same As) 2023-03-13 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
County Government--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Taxation
Taxation--County
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB2054 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB02054I.htm |