TX HB230 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to recovery of attorney's fees in certain civil cases.
Title
Relating to recovery of attorney's fees in certain civil cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-03-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-03-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2015-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB230 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB00230I.htm |