TX HB230 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to intelligence databases for combinations and criminal street gangs.
Title
Relating to intelligence databases for combinations and criminal street gangs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
AUDITOR, STATE
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
GANGS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Electronic Information Systems
GANGS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF