TX HB2495 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-23 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to reporting child abuse and neglect and to training regarding recognizing and reporting child abuse and neglect at schools, institutions of higher education, and other entities.
Title
Relating to reporting child abuse and neglect and to training regarding recognizing and reporting child abuse and neglect at schools, institutions of higher education, and other entities.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-09 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2013-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHILD ABUSE
Day Care
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Day Care
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING