TX HB2864 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for mortgage servicers in connection with loans for the purchase of residential property.
Title
Relating to requirements for mortgage servicers in connection with loans for the purchase of residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-08 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2013-03-19 | House | Read first time |
2013-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=HB2864 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/HB02864I.htm |