TX HB2864 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Withdrawn from schedule
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of certificates of self-insurance.
Title
Relating to the issuance of certificates of self-insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Long-term Infrastructure Planning by chair |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-18 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
TAXICABS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
TAXICABS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB2864 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB02864I.htm |