TX HB3110 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of permits for certain facilities regulated by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Title
Relating to the issuance of permits for certain facilities regulated by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-29 | Corrected comm. report distributed | |
2011-04-29 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Energy Resources | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Air
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS
Environment--Air
Environment--General
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Oil & Gas
PERMITS