TX HB3136 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to greater flexibility over the administration and operation of the Medicaid program.
Title
Relating to greater flexibility over the administration and operation of the Medicaid program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-06 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-18 | Referred to Public Health | |
2011-03-18 | Read first time | |
2011-03-10 | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB3136 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB03136I.htm |