TX HB3486 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to higher education curricula, including course enrollment and credit and degree and certificate programs.
Title
Relating to higher education curricula, including course enrollment and credit and degree and certificate programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2023-05-08 | House | Companion considered in lieu of SB 1887 |
2023-05-04 | House | Postponed 5/8/23 10:00 AM |
2023-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-03-16 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1887 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Effective immediately
SB1887 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Effective immediately
SB1887 (Same As) 2023-05-23 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
TRANSFER STUDENTS
Education--Higher
EDUCATION--HIGHER--CURRICULUM
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
TRANSFER STUDENTS