TX HB3854 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the powers of certain development corporations related to Hurricane Ike disaster relief and to the validation of certain governmental acts or proceedings of counties affected by Hurricane Ike.
Title
Relating to the powers of certain development corporations related to Hurricane Ike disaster relief and to the validation of certain governmental acts or proceedings of counties affected by Hurricane Ike.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-18 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-24 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-04-24 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-22 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-22 | Record vote | |
2009-04-22 | Passed | |
2009-04-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-22 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-17 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-16 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-09 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1752 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
BONDS
County Government
County Government--Finance
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
County Government
County Government--Finance
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General