TX HB4244 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Business & Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to executory contract for conveyance.
Title
Relating to executory contract for conveyance.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Elkins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4244 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04244I.htm |