TX HB572 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-27 - Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
Pending: House Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the confiscation of packaged, unopened fireworks by a municipality that regulates fireworks.
Title
Relating to the confiscation of packaged, unopened fireworks by a municipality that regulates fireworks.
Sponsors
Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. Venton Jones [D] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] |
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-27 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2023-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-23 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2023-02-23 | House | Read first time |
2022-11-14 | House | Filed |