TX HB774 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-13 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-13 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to applying credit earned by a student at a general academic teaching institution to an associate's degree at a lower-division institution of higher education previously attended by the student.
Title
Relating to applying credit earned by a student at a general academic teaching institution to an associate's degree at a lower-division institution of higher education previously attended by the student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-03 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-03-24 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-03-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-02-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2013-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
TRANSFER STUDENTS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--State Coordination
Education--Junior College Districts
TRANSFER STUDENTS