TX HB783 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain offenses that involve impersonating a peace officer or other public servant and misrepresenting the nature of certain property.
Title
Relating to certain offenses that involve impersonating a peace officer or other public servant and misrepresenting the nature of certain property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-26 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-04-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time | |
2011-01-21 | Filed |