TX HB792 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Government Transparency & Operation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Government Transparency & Operation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exception from disclosure under the public information law for information related to competition or bidding.
Title
Relating to the exception from disclosure under the public information law for information related to competition or bidding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2017-03-06 | House | Correction in referral |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-02-28 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB792 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00792I.htm |