TX HJR127 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow an officer or enlisted member of the Texas State Guard or other state militia or military force to hold other civil offices.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to allow an officer or enlisted member of the Texas State Guard or other state militia or military force to hold other civil offices.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Norma Chavez [D] | Sen. Phil King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-30 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-30 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-30 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-30 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-29 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-29 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Passed | |
2009-05-25 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-25 | Record vote | |
2009-05-25 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-25 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-25 | Amended | |
2009-05-25 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-25 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-12 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-12 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-11 | Record vote | |
2009-05-11 | Adopted | |
2009-05-11 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-05-11 | Postponed | |
2009-05-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB3936 (Enabled by) 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
SB833 (Enabled by) 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
SB833 (Enabled by) 2009-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
Military & Veterans
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
STATE GUARD, TEXAS
State Officers
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
STATE GUARD, TEXAS
State Officers