TX HJR145 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Received from the House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions located in areas of the state affected by a disaster.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment authorizing the issuance of general obligation bonds to provide financial assistance to political subdivisions located in areas of the state affected by a disaster.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - House - Adopted as amended RV#762 (Y: 102 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - RV#761 (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#667 (Y: 72 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2019-04-26 - House - RV#761 (Y: 120 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Amended RV#667 (Y: 72 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#762 |
2019-04-26 | House | Adopted as amended |
2019-04-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#761 |
2019-04-26 | House | Amended 1-S. Davis |
2019-04-26 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#667 |
2019-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Amended 1-Coleman |
2019-04-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-23 | House | Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-23 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-04-17 | House | Postponed 4/23/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-02 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Political Subdivisions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Disaster Preparedness & Relief
Political Subdivisions
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control