TX HJR9 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and lubricants and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used and authorizing the legislature to provide for automatic adjustments of the rates of motor fuel taxes.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment prescribing the purposes for which revenue from motor vehicle registration fees and taxes on motor fuels and lubricants and certain revenues received from the federal government may be used and authorizing the legislature to provide for automatic adjustments of the rates of motor fuel taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-11 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-11 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SJR24 (Same As) 2009-03-13 - Referred to Finance
SJR52 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
HJR122 (Same As) 2009-04-21 - Left pending in committee
SJR52 (Same As) 2009-05-22 - Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
HJR122 (Same As) 2009-04-21 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Motor Fuels
Transportation
Transportation--Mass Transit
Transportation--Railroads