TX SB1263 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-14 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to allowing parents to petition for repurposing, alternative management, or closure of certain public school campuses.
Title
Relating to allowing parents to petition for repurposing, alternative management, or closure of certain public school campuses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-14 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2013-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Family
Family--Parent & Child
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Family
Family--Parent & Child