TX SB140 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a periodic review and expiration dates of state and local tax preferences.
Title
Relating to a periodic review and expiration dates of state and local tax preferences.
Sponsors
Sen. Rodney Ellis [D] | Sen. John Carona [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-25 | Senate | No action taken in subcommittee |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR12 (Enabling for) 2013-04-30 - Co-author authorized
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Taxation
Taxation--General
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Taxation
Taxation--General
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB140 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00140I.htm |