TX SB1486 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-12 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the electronic payment of ad valorem taxes; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the electronic payment of ad valorem taxes; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2023-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1608 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1608 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1608 (Same As) 2023-03-07 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ELECTRONIC FUNDS TRANSFER
Electronic Information Systems
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous
ELECTRONIC FUNDS TRANSFER
Electronic Information Systems
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Assessment & Collection
Taxation--Property-Miscellaneous