TX SB1486 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the repeal of the authority of political subdivisions to adopt or enforce juvenile curfews.
Title
Relating to the repeal of the authority of political subdivisions to adopt or enforce juvenile curfews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-05-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB561 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
CURFEWS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Political Subdivisions
TRUANCY
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Crimes
Crimes--Juvenile
CURFEWS
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Political Subdivisions
TRUANCY