TX SB151 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal penalties for possession or delivery of marihuana and marihuana concentrate.
Title
Relating to the criminal penalties for possession or delivery of marihuana and marihuana concentrate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB439 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
MARIHUANA
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB151 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00151I.htm |