TX SB1520 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the protection and care of individuals with mental retardation residing in certain residential care facilities.
Title
Relating to the protection and care of individuals with mental retardation residing in certain residential care facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Human Services | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Amended | |
2009-04-24 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-07 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Civil Procedure
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
PATIENT RIGHTS & PROTECTION
RESTRAINTS
Courts--Civil Procedure
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
Mental Health & Mental Retardation
PATIENT RIGHTS & PROTECTION
RESTRAINTS