TX SB1544 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to no-knock warrants.
Title
Relating to no-knock warrants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ARREST WARRANTS
BREONNA TAYLOR-ATATIANA JEFFERSON SAFE USE OF FORCE ACT
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS
BREONNA TAYLOR-ATATIANA JEFFERSON SAFE USE OF FORCE ACT
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PEACE OFFICERS