TX SB1545 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of eligible central municipality for purposes of the municipal hotel occupancy tax.
Title
Relating to the definition of eligible central municipality for purposes of the municipal hotel occupancy tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy
City Government--Finance
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Taxation
Taxation--Hotel, Motel Occupancy