TX SB2541 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Recommendations filed with the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of the Rolling V Ranch Water Control and Improvement District No. 1 of Wise County.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of the Rolling V Ranch Water Control and Improvement District No. 1 of Wise County.
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Fallon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4642 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
ROLLING V RANCH WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
WISE COUNTY
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
WISE COUNTY
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2541 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02541I.htm |