TX SB568 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Public Education
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-04 - Referred to Public Education
Summary
Relating to a notification requirement if a counselor is not assigned to a public school campus.
Title
Relating to a notification requirement if a counselor is not assigned to a public school campus.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Referred to Public Education | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-27 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-23 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-23 | Referred to Education | |
2009-02-23 | Read first time | |
2009-01-28 | Filed | |
2009-01-28 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1334 (Similar To) 2009-03-02 - Referred to Public Education
HB2493 (Similar To) 2009-03-11 - Referred to Public Education
HB2957 (Similar To) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Public Education
HB2493 (Similar To) 2009-03-11 - Referred to Public Education
HB2957 (Similar To) 2009-03-17 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR