TX SB568 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to access by a public institution of higher education to the criminal history record information of certain persons seeking to reside in on-campus housing.
Title
Relating to access by a public institution of higher education to the criminal history record information of certain persons seeking to reside in on-campus housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-02 | Referred to Higher Education | |
2011-05-02 | Read first time | |
2011-04-28 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-28 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-04-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2011-02-09 | Filed | |
2011-02-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Faculty
Crimes--Miscellaneous
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Faculty