TX SB810 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the identification of breeder deer.
Title
Relating to the identification of breeder deer.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Rep. John Cyrier [R] | Rep. Lyle Larson [R] | Rep. Four Price [R] | Rep. Tracy King [D] |
Rep. Chris Paddie [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-19 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1508 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1507 |
2019-05-17 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2019-05-17 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-17 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Animals
Electronic Information Systems
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
Electronic Information Systems
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--General
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses