TX SB903 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-30 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-30 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for certain intoxication offenses.
Title
Relating to the punishment for certain intoxication offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-04-13 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-04-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-21 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-08 | Read first time | |
2011-02-23 | Filed | |
2011-02-23 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
IGNITION INTERLOCK DEVICE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
IGNITION INTERLOCK DEVICE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=SB903 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/SB00903I.htm |